OR HB3624 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Chapter 87, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Chapter 87, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to appraisal management companies; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to appraisal management companies; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Buckley [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Tomei [D] | Rep. Suzanne Van Orman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Chapter 87, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2010. | |
2010-03-23 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-23 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Frederick, Kahl, Schaufler, Tomei. | |
2010-02-23 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Nelson. | |
2010-02-23 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (Amendments distributed.) | |
2010-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2010-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-20 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 2--Gilliam, Schaufler. | |
2010-02-15 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-12 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-11 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-03 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Accountability. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |