OR HB4021 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 28, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 28, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs public universities to charge nonresident veteran who is graduate student tuition and fees no greater than resident rate if nonresident veteran received either honorable discharge or general discharge under honorable conditions and provides proof of physical presence in Oregon within 12 months of enrollment. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to veterans' educational benefits; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 28, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014. |
2014-03-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Matthews. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson. |
2014-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2014-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |