OR HB4028 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 56, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 56, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Oregon State Lottery to use moneys allocated for payment of costs of administration of state lottery to pay expenses incurred to implement policies related to problem gambling, to collect data related to problem gambling and to advertise availability of programs for treatment of problem gambling. Increases amount of moneys allocated from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to Problem Gambling Treatment Fund. Requires use of specified portion of allocation for promoting or advertising Allows Oregon State Lottery to use moneys allocated for payment of costs of administration of state lottery to pay expenses incurred to implement policies related to problem gambling, to collect data related to problem gambling and to advertise availability of programs for prevention and treatment of problem gambling. Becomes operative July 1, 2014. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to problem gambling treatment; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 56, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014. |
2014-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--George, Girod, Whitsett; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Tomei, Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 3--Gilliam, Sprenger, Whitsett. |
2014-02-10 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2014-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |