OR HB4090 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removes EFSC power over a project that makes clean power or is a power line, is only on U.S. lands and is reviewed under NEPA. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.0). Prohibits the Energy Facility Siting Council from exercising jurisdiction over or requiring a site certificate for an energy facility that is a renewable energy facility or transmission line, is sited wholly within federal lands and is subject to review under the National Environmental Policy Act. Requires the person seeking federal approval for the energy facility to consult with local governments within whose jurisdiction the facility is proposed to be located or whose jurisdiction adjoins the proposed facility on potential impacts.
Title
Relating to the permitting of energy facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Mark Gamba [D] | Rep. Gregory Smith [R] | Rep. Tom Andersen [D] |
Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Court Boice [R] | Rep. Jeff Helfrich [R] | Rep. Emerson Levy [D] |
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Boomer Wright [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] |
Sen. Aaron Woods [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2024-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gamba. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 19--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Diehl, Elmer, Evans, Goodwin, Hieb, Holvey, Lewis, Marsh, McIntire, McLain, Nathanson, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wallan, Yunker; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Lively. |
2024-02-19 | House | Second reading. |
2024-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2024-02-15 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |