OR HB5001 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 377, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 377, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Oregon Board of Accountancy. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Oregon Board of Accountancy. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Board of Accountancy; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 377, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021. |
2021-06-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Grayber, Hayden. |
2021-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-05-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-05-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |