OR HB5012 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 356, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 356, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Justice for biennial expenses of district attorneys. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Justice for biennial expenses of district attorneys. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Justice; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | Chapter 356, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023. |
2023-07-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 50; Excused, 9--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Elmer, Javadi, Levy B, Morgan, Osborne, Tran, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Reschke. |
2023-05-31 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-05-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-15 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-05-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-02 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |