OR HB5202 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 108, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 108, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by Construction Contractors Board, Department of Consumer and Business Services and Oregon Health Authority. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Chapter 108, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Knopp, Olsen declared potential conflict of interest. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Close, Ferrioli, George, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 35; Nays, 23--Bentz, Cameron, Davis, Esquivel, Fagan, Freeman, Gallegos, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Conger, Thompson. |
2014-03-07 | House | Second reading. |
2014-03-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-03-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-03-06 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2014-03-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-03-05 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |