OR HCR16 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes addiction as disease.
Title
Recognizing addiction as a disease.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Motion to refer to Rules carried on voice vote. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Taken from 05-20 Calendar and placed on 05-22 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Taken from 05-13 Calendar and placed on 05-20 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. resolution. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-11 | House | Read. Carried by Clem. Adopted. Ayes, 45; Nays, 15--Bentz, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Krieger, Olson, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett. |
2013-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |