OR HCR37 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes limitations and deadlines for legislative measures for 2014 regular session of Seventy-seventh Legislative Assembly.
Title
Establishing limitations and deadlines for legislative measures for 2014 regular session of Seventy-seventh Legislative Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Final reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Adopted. Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Girod, Kruse; excused, 1--Starr. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-07 | House | Rules suspended. Read. Carried by Garrett. Adopted. Ayes, 48; Nays, 12--Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Hanna, Johnson, Krieger, Parrish, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant. |
2013-07-07 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-07-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-07-06 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-07-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |