OR HJR36 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Urging school districts to require students to successfully complete course in civics and government education, or otherwise demonstrate proficiency in civics and government, prior to graduation from high school.
Title
Urging school districts to require students to successfully complete course in civics and government education, or otherwise demonstrate proficiency in civics and government, prior to graduation from high school.
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Bonamici [D] | Rep. Tim Freeman [R] | Rep. John Huffman [R] | Rep. Mike McLane [R] |
Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-04-22 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. | |
2011-04-19 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-18 | Read. Carried by Whisnant. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Cowan; Excused, 2--Hicks, Richardson. | |
2011-04-14 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-13 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 14, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-12 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-11 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-05 | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-03-30 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Education. | |
2011-02-21 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |