OR SB1517 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date, June 6, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date, June 6, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Act would let the urban flood safety and water quality district impose an annual charge on lands that are benefited by district works. The Act would let the district impose a fee on cities and counties for district costs not covered by the annual charge. The Act would change how the district winds up other water-related districts. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.2). Authorizes the urban flood safety and water quality district to annually assess benefited lands within the managed floodplain for the total amount of revenues required to pay the costs for the succeeding year of district works that directly benefit the lands. Authorizes the district to impose a fee on cities and counties for the overall fixed costs of operating the district and district works. Amends provisions relating to the governance and the dissolution of existing drainage districts and corporations for the use and control of water lying within the boundaries of the urban flood safety and water quality district. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the urban flood safety and water quality district; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Effective date, June 6, 2024. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 49, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 10--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Goodwin, Hieb, McIntire, Osborne, Reschke, Wallan, Yunker; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Javadi; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Sanchez, Speaker Rayfield. |
2024-02-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 4, 2024 Calendar. |
2024-02-28 | House | Second reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2024-02-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans. |
2024-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Bonham granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Girod, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |