OR SB1563 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The Act requires ODOT to study a section of U.S. Highway 101. ODOT must make a report of the study and share its findings with the JCT. ODOT may start work on the study as soon as the Act is passed. (Flesch Readability Score: 74.5). Requires the Department of Transportation to conduct a review of a specific portion of U.S. Highway 101 and present a report to the Joint Committee on Transportation no later than September 15, 2024. Sunsets January 2, 2025. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to U.S. Highway 101; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Transportation, then Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |