OR SB1578 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Board of Education to adopt by rule procedures for Department of Education to investigate and resolve allegations of violations of state or federal law that may result in physical harm, denial of instructional days or risk of significant harm or substantial interference with student's ability to safely access public education. Directs State Board of Education to adopt by rule procedures for receiving and investigating complaints of violations of safety, discrimination and welfare laws.] Prescribes requirements for process of taking complaint that school or education service district is nonstandard.] Directs State Board of Education to adopt by rule procedures for Department of Education to investigate and resolve allegations of violations of state or federal law that may result in physical harm, denial of instructional days or risk of significant harm or substantial interference with student's ability to safely access public education. Prescribes actions department may take if school district or education service district is found to be in violation of state or federal law. Directs board to adopt by rule requirements for process that education service district must use when district receives complaint that district is not meeting standards established by board. Expands investigative authority of Superintendent of Public Instruction to investigate and resolve complaints of violations relating to special education or early childhood special education. Requires department to appoint at least two individuals to act as student and family advocates. Prescribes duties of advocates. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to violations of education law; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |