OR SB1582 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective date, January 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective date, January 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Department of State Lands.
Title
Relating to the Department of State Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Effective date, January 1, 2013. | |
2012-04-12 | Chapter 108, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-04-11 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-21 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-06 | President signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith G.. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Smith J.; Absent, 1--Johnson. | |
2012-03-05 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2012-03-05 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-03-05 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-03-05 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Morse. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-03-05 | Second reading. | |
2012-03-05 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)(Amendments distributed) | |
2012-03-05 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-15 | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |