OR SB1588 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective date, June 4, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective date, June 4, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to exclusion from the definition of employment for certain service performed for certain owner-operator managed entities; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to exclusion from the definition of employment for certain service performed for certain owner-operator managed entities; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Effective date, June 4, 2012. | |
2012-04-12 | Chapter 109, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-04-11 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-02 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-01 | President signed. | |
2012-02-29 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith J.. | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading. Carried by Esquivel. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 29--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Beyer, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Frederick, Garrett, Gelser, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Hunt, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Matthews, Nathanson, Nolan, Read, Schaufler, Smith J., Tomei, Witt, Speaker Roblan. | |
2012-02-28 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 29, 2012 Calendar. | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-27 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-27 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-24 | Referred to Rules by order of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-24 | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-22 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Business and Labor. | |
2012-02-17 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-17 | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-16 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-16 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-14 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |