OR SB372 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, September 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, September 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to personal injury protection benefits; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to personal injury protection benefits; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Effective date, September 1, 2011. | |
2011-08-03 | Chapter 707, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-28 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-27 | President signed. | |
2011-06-22 | Third reading. Carried by Cowan. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Hanna. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 22, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-20 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-17 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-06-16 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Revenue. | |
2011-06-15 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-06-14 | Third reading. Carried by Atkinson. Passed. Ayes, 23; nays, 2--Boquist, Whitsett; excused, 5--Burdick, Edwards, George, Nelson, Telfer. | |
2011-06-13 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-10 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-06-07 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-26 | Motion to refer to Rules carried. | |
2011-04-25 | Taken from 04-25 Calendar and placed on 04-26 Calendar on voice vote. | |
2011-04-21 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-21 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-04-18 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |