OR SB800 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Reserve Funds to study performance of Education Stability Fund and Oregon Rainy Day Fund and make recommendations to next odd-numbered year regular session of Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Task Force on Reserve Funds; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Devlin [D] | Sen. Mark Hass [D] | Sen. Brian Boquist [R] | Sen. Jackie Winters [R] |
Rep. Peter Buckley [D] | Rep. Gregory Smith [R] | Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] | Rep. Philip Barnhart [D] |
Rep. Tobias Read [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Effective date, July 27, 2015. |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Chapter 797, 2015 Laws. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2015-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2015-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue, then Ways and Means. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |