OR SCR221 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-25 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-25 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adjourns sine die 2020 second special session of Eightieth Legislative Assembly. Adjourns sine die 2020 second special session of Eightieth Legislative Assembly.
Title
Adjourning sine die the 2020 second special session of the Eightieth Legislative Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-10 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-25 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2020-08-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-08-10 | House | Rules suspended. Read. Carried by Smith Warner. Adopted. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Hayden, Nosse; Excused, 3--Barreto, Mitchell, Power. |
2020-08-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Final reading. Resolution read in it's entirety. Carried by Wagner. Adopted. Ayes, 23; Nays, 1--Girod; Excused, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Hansell, Heard, Olsen, Thomsen. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Referred to The Second Special Session of 2020. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |