PA HB1540 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Act No. 73 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Act No. 73 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, further providing for Commission for Agricultural Education Excellence.
Title
In terms and courses of study, further providing for Commission for Agricultural Education Excellence.
Sponsors
Rep. Darisha Parker [D] | Rep. Ben Sanchez [D] | Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] | Rep. Nancy Guenst [D] |
Rep. Christopher Rabb [D] | Rep. Maureen Madden [D] | Rep. Eddie Pashinski [D] | Rep. Johanny Cepeda-Freytiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1540 PN 3496, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1540 PN 3496, CONCURRENCE (Y: 138 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended A02933 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1540 PN 2050, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 123 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1540 PN 2050, 2023 A2164, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1540 PN 2050, 2023 A2218, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1540 PN 2050, 2023 A2217, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01748 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A02118 (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1540 PN 3496, CONCURRENCE (Y: 138 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended A02933 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1540 PN 2050, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 123 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1540 PN 2050, 2023 A2164, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1540 PN 2050, 2023 A2218, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1540 PN 2050, 2023 A2217, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01748 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A02118 (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-17 | House | Act No. 73 of 2024 |
2024-07-17 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2024-07-12 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2024-07-11 | House | Signed in Senate |
2024-07-11 | House | Signed in House |
2024-07-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (138-64) |
2024-07-11 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2024-07-11 | House | Referred to RULES |
2024-07-11 | House | In the House |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2024-07-09 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2024-07-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-11-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-10-13 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2023-10-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-10-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (123-80) |
2023-10-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-10-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-03 | House | Second consideration |
2023-10-02 | House | Removed from table |
2023-09-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-09-27 | House | First consideration |
2023-09-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-06-28 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |