RI H5284 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - State Building Code: would authorize and direct the state building code standards committee to update the state building code so as to be consistent with the revisions to the Americans with Disabilities Act
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - State Building Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-28 | Senate passed as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-23 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-21 | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-21 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-01 | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government | |
2011-05-25 | House passed as amended (floor amendment) | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-23 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-15 | Committee transferred to House Corporations | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5284.pdf |