RI H7016 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor Vehicle Operator Licenses - Veterans (would Direct The Administrator Of The Dmv To Issue Operators' Licenses With A Designation That The Holder Is A Veteran. A Fee Shall Be Paid To The Division Of Motor Vehicles For The Veteran Designation.)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor Vehicle Operator Licenses - Veterans (would Direct The Administrator Of The Dmv To Issue Operators' Licenses With A Designation That The Holder Is A Veteran. A Fee Shall Be Paid To The Division Of Motor Vehicles For The Veteran Designation.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-06 | House passed Sub B as amended in concurrence | |
2012-05-31 | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2012) | |
2012-05-31 | Senate passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment) | |
2012-05-29 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2012) | |
2012-05-16 | Committee recommends passage of Sub B | |
2012-05-16 | Committee recommended indefinite postponement | |
2012-05-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2012) | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs | |
2012-01-17 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-01-11 | Placed on House Calendar (01/17/2012) | |
2012-01-11 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-01-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/11/2012) | |
2012-01-04 | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7016.pdf |