RI H7016 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows businesses that had an insurance policy in place for business interruption as of March 9, 2020 or thereafter to recover from their insurance companies for a COVID-19 business impact.
Title
Covid-19 Pandemic Insurance Recovery Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2022) |
2022-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7016.pdf |