RI H7046 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-10 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-10 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- STUDENT COMPUTER DEVICE PRIVACY - Prohibits an educational institution or school district from accessing or using location data for tracking a student's institutional device or personal device, except in limited circumstances.
Title
Prohibits an educational institution or school district from accessing or using location data for tracking a student's institutional device or personal device, except in limited circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2024-06-10 | House | House read and passed |
2024-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2024) |
2024-06-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2024) |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology |