RI H7095 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government (would Codify The Public Corruption And White Collar Crime Unit Within The Department Of Attorney General.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government (would Codify The Public Corruption And White Collar Crime Unit Within The Department Of Attorney General.)
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Michael Marcello [D] |
Rep. Larry Valencia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2012) | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7095.pdf |