RI H7095 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- DIGITAL ELECTRONICS RIGHT TO REPAIR ACT - Establishes a digital electronics right to repair, which would allow for digital electronic equipment and parts that are sold in this state on or after January 1, 2025, to be repaired at an independent repair provider.
Title
Establishes a digital electronics right to repair, which would allow for digital electronic equipment and parts that are sold in this state on or after January 1, 2025, to be repaired at an independent repair provider.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2024) |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology |
Subjects
Commercial Law
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- DIGITAL ELECTRONICS RIGHT TO REPAIR ACT
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- DIGITAL ELECTRONICS RIGHT TO REPAIR ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7095.pdf |