RI H7111 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the harbor seal as the official state marine mammal.
Title
State Emblems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-01-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2016) |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |