RI H7142 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (the Honorable Justice Of The Commonwealth Of Virginia Julie Cannon To Join Carly Sokol And Alexander Michel In Marriage)
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (the Honorable Justice Of The Commonwealth Of Virginia Julie Cannon To Join Carly Sokol And Alexander Michel In Marriage)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-03-10 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-03-10 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | House read and passed | |
2010-01-27 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-01-27 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7142.pdf |