RI H7159 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DEPARTMENTS OF STATE GOVERNMENT - State websites to comply with WCAG 2.2 standards by July 1, 2026.
Title
State websites to comply with WCAG 2.2 standards by July 1, 2026.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2024) |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7159.pdf |