RI H7213 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- RHODE ISLAND PHYSICAL THERAPIST LICENSURE COMPACT ACT - Allows the state to become a member of the physical therapist licensure compact adopted by twenty-five (25) states in order to facilitate the interstate practice of physical therapy with the goal of improving public access to physical therapy services.
Title
Allows the state to become a member of the physical therapist licensure compact adopted by twenty-five (25) states in order to facilitate the interstate practice of physical therapy with the goal of improving public access to physical therapy services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2024) |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2024-05-07 | House | House read and passed |
2024-05-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2024) |
2024-05-02 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2024) |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/30/2024) |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Businesses And Professions
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- RHODE ISLAND PHYSICAL THERAPIST LICENSURE COMPACT ACT
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- RHODE ISLAND PHYSICAL THERAPIST LICENSURE COMPACT ACT