RI H7216 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- WEAPONS - Defines "crime gun" and requires law enforcement to submit crime gun or 2 fired cartridge cases seized to state crime laboratory or the BATF for testing and tracing and also requires 2 test-fired cartridge cases to be entered into NIBIN.
Title
Defines "crime gun" and requires law enforcement to submit crime gun or 2 fired cartridge cases seized to state crime laboratory or the BATF for testing and tracing and also requires 2 test-fired cartridge cases to be entered into NIBIN.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2024-05-28 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-05-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/28/2024) |
2024-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2024) |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2024) |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |