RI H7241 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renames a portion of highway on Chopmist Hill Road from Route 44 in Chepachet to Route 6 in Scituate, now known a Hartford Pike, as the Gold Star Family Highway.
Title
The Gold Star Family Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2018) |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7241.pdf |