RI H7290 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- COMPULSORY ATTENDANCE - Directs each local education agency adopt a program to monitor absenteeism data to identify students who are at risk for chronic absenteeism before it becomes a chronic situation.
Title
Directs each local education agency adopt a program to monitor absenteeism data to identify students who are at risk for chronic absenteeism before it becomes a chronic situation.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Brandon Voas [D] |
Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2024) |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7290.pdf |