RI H7304 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that municipal insurance corporations be subject to laws regulating insurance companies and be regulated by the Rhode Island department of business regulation.
Title
Relating To Towns And Cities
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2020) |
2020-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7304.pdf |