RI H7309 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- DISORDERLY CONDUCT - Requires disorderly conduct to include an actual public disturbance as evidenced by gathering of people drawn to and watching conduct and prohibits police officers from being complainant for purposes of establishing offense.
Title
Requires disorderly conduct to include an actual public disturbance as evidenced by gathering of people drawn to and watching conduct and prohibits police officers from being complainant for purposes of establishing offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7309.pdf |