RI H7318 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds sexual trafficking to registerable offenses.
Title
Sexual Offender Registration And Community Notification
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. John Desimone [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-07 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-05-05 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-04-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/05/2016) |
2016-04-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-04-25 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration (04/27/2016) |
2016-04-06 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/06/2016) |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2016) |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |