RI H7318 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Dyslexia Advocacy Rhode Island plates to be issued for passenger or commercial vehicles. A minimum of six hundred (600) preordered plates would be required.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] |
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2022) |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2022) |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |