RI H7393 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- REGISTRATION OF VOTERS - Increases role of division of motor vehicles in voter registration and addresses verification process, by establishing very specific obligations and responsibilities that must be followed before offering an individual application to register to vote.
Title
Increases role of division of motor vehicles in voter registration and addresses verification process, by establishing very specific obligations and responsibilities that must be followed before offering an individual application to register to vote.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] |
Rep. Jon Brien [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2024) |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7393.pdf |