RI H7418 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the city council of the city of Warwick to enact ordinances authorizing the Warwick police department to impounded off-road non-registered vehicles that are unlawfully used on public streets.
Title
Applicability Of Traffic Regulations
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-02 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |