RI H7432 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the deceased spousal unused credit against the Rhode Island estate tax available to a surviving spouse for the unused estate tax credit of the first spouse to decease.
Title
Estate And Transfer Taxes -- Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7432.pdf |