RI H7435 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require that the compensation for city and town budget commission members be paid by the state
Title
Budget Commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2014) |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7435.pdf |