RI H7458 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that title examiners, attorney, and members of a legally incorporated genealogical society would be allowed to examine death certificates filed with the department of health.
Title
Vital Records
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-08-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/02/2016) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-04-12 | House | House read and passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/12/2016) |
2016-03-29 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-03-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/29/2016) |
2016-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2016) |
2016-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |