RI H7461 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- RELIEF OF INJURED AND DECEASED FIRE FIGHTERS AND POLICE OFFICERS - Allows the presumption of in-the-line-of-duty illness unless contrary evidence is presented.
Title
Allows the presumption of in-the-line-of-duty illness unless contrary evidence is presented.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Matthew Dawson [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Towns And Cities
TOWNS AND CITIES -- RELIEF OF INJURED AND DECEASED FIRE FIGHTERS AND POLICE OFFICERS
TOWNS AND CITIES -- RELIEF OF INJURED AND DECEASED FIRE FIGHTERS AND POLICE OFFICERS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7461.pdf |