RI H7467 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires returns of a marriage certificate to be filed within two (2) business days after the ceremony, and would validate the common practice of filing the return by mail.
Title
Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018) |
2018-03-20 | House | Meeting postponed (03/21/2018) |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7467.pdf |