RI H7472 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits commercial motor trucks or tractors with a gross weight exceeding four (4) tons from traveling on that portion of Route 116 known as Smith Avenue in the town of Smithfield.
Title
Truck Weight Limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Truck weight limits (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Truck weight limits (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-26 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2016) |
2016-03-16 | House | Meeting postponed (03/17/2016) |
2016-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2016-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2016) |
2016-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |