RI H7477 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an innkeeper to remove any guest who is a level III high risk to reoffend sexual offender who attempts to remain a hotel resident for more than thirty (30) consecutive days in any calendar year.
Title
Hotels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2020) |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7477.pdf |