RI H7480 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - House passed Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - House passed Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the director of environmental management to appoint one or more inspectors in the state rather than a commissioner in each county to inquire into the condition of any domestic animal
Title
Animal Diseases In General
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage of amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage of amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2014-05-20 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-04-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/20/2014) |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/17/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2014) |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |