RI H7537 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a person from electronically disseminating visual images of another engaged in sexually explicit conduct where a reasonable person would know the image was to remain private.
Title
Electronic Imaging Devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - Senate - Electronic imaging devices (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2016-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-08 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2016) |
2016-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2016) |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |