RI H7552 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restores the regionalization bonus in foundation education aid for certain regionalized school districts.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7552.pdf |