RI H7574 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the RI Real Estate Time-Share Act to provide for dissolution of the time-share form of ownership by fewer than 60% of the owners in certain circumstances.
Title
Rhode Island Real Estate Time-share Act - Termination Of Time Shares
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. John Carnevale [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House voted to recommit to House Judiciary |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2016) |
2016-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2016) |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |