RI H7619 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- TOXIC PACKAGING REDUCTION ACT - Updates the existing Toxic Packaging Act by delaying the ban on PFAS in food packaging until January 1, 2025, and in processing agents until July 1, 2027.
Title
Updates the existing Toxic Packaging Act by delaying the ban on PFAS in food packaging until January 1, 2025, and in processing agents until July 1, 2027.
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. George Nardone [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-05 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2024) |
2024-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-24 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2024) |
2024-05-20 | House | Meeting postponed (05/21/2024) |
2024-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |